Financial history Hartlepower Community Trust

Charity number: 1174390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £21.50k £65.00k £104.03k £153.02k £222.82k
Total expenditure £500 £66.57k £58.83k £142.04k £190.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.46k £23.48k £52.09k