THE BUS SHELTER MK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We will provide shelter and support to homeless rough sleepers within the Borough of Milton Keynes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 06 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Williams | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Tait | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Armstrong Christie | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stephen Thompson | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Albert Yoofi Clarke | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ellis Rust | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pete Smith | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dave Pickering | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.74k | £268.40k | £210.98k | £221.80k | £357.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.70k | £300.09k | £107.14k | £165.44k | £275.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON REGISTERED ON 06 JUL 2017 AMENDED TO CIO FOUNDATION 19 JUN 2019 AMENDED ON 23 SEP 2021 as amended on 20 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PERSONS, OR THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS, WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES, BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, SHELTER, WARMTH, FOOD, ADVICE, SIGNPOSTING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Management Office
George House
Crosslands
Stantonbury
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 6DB
- Phone:
- 01908429889
- Email:
- info@thebussheltermk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window