Financial history GREEN STREET GREEN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1172661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £16.38k £29.36k £25.02k £16.32k £92.10k
Total expenditure £7.41k £22.28k £22.89k £19.75k £36.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A