Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS' STOPSLEY

Charity number: 1175152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 July 2020 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 July 2020 263 days late Download Open in new window