Accounts and annual returns OASIS COMMUNITY HUB: HOBMOOR

Charity number: 1172925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window