Compassion Acts

Charity number: 1172948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time Download