Accounts and annual returns CAMP 4 KIDS
Charity number: 1172552
Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 108 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 108 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1203 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2019 | 11 January 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2019 | 11 January 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window