Financial history ARLINGHAM VICTORY HALL

Charity number: 1173603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £67.96k £223.89k £14.96k £15.24k £17.39k
Total expenditure £8.62k £286.20k £39.33k £7.14k £9.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £2.67k N/A N/A