Trustees INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL ON MONUMENTS AND SITES, UK
Charity number: 1175871

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clara Arokiasamy | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
William Garrett | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Dr Valeria Passetti | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Carl Carrington | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Christopher Underwood | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Hazel McGregor | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Deniz Beck | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Brandi Hall-Crossgrove | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Professor Keith Lilley | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Dr SIAN ELUNED REES | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Dorian Crone | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
ROBERT EARLY | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
PETER MARSDEN | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Sarah Simmonds | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
MICHAEL MAIL | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Andrew Gilbert Webster FCA DChA | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.