BRIGHTON FESTIVAL CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to promote and develop the public education and appreciation of music through the study, practice and performance of music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 06 June 2017: CIO registration
- 08 October 2019: Funds received from 283743 BRIGHTON FESTIVAL CHORUS
- BFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Reeve | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIM EVANS | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GUY DAVIDSON | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr FIONA RUTH McNAE | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|||||
ALASTAIR WILLIAM GREENWAY DEIGHTON | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|||||
ANN CHRISTINE MILLER | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
LUCY VICTORIA BRETT | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|||||
TIM ROUNDING | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BLOWS | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.77k | £61.78k | £93.24k | £127.02k | £128.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.30k | £67.26k | £101.02k | £113.20k | £115.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC THROUGH THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pools
Shoreham Road
HENFIELD
West Sussex
BN5 9SE
- Phone:
- 01273472299
- Email:
- treasurer@bfc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window