LAKE DISTRICT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment and cultural heritage of the Lake District by inspiring people to care for and contribute to the natural environment and cultural heritage of the Lake District and Cumbria; and providing funding and support for conservation, environmental and cultural initiatives in the Lake District and Cumbria

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 2017: CIO registration
  • 15 January 2019: Funds received from 1130453 NURTURE CUMBRIA LTD
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keith Ashcroft Chair 09 August 2017
None on record
Richard Alastair Bracewell Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Jodie Alice Mills Trustee 26 February 2025
THE RIVERS TRUST
Received: On time
STEPHEN LESLIE NICOL Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Benjamin Michael Patton Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Kate Elizabeth Stark Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Gavin Anthony Capstick Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Andrew Neil Brown Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
David Graham Booth Trustee 18 May 2023
THE BOOTH BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Dan Visser Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Andrew Airey Trustee 09 August 2017
PAPYRUS PREVENTION OF YOUNG SUICIDE
Received: On time
Mike Innerdale Trustee 09 August 2017
None on record
Gill Haigh Trustee 09 August 2017
None on record
PETER RICHARD WAVELL HENSMAN Trustee 09 August 2017
RAVENGLASS RAILWAY MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £402.83k £317.92k £640.51k £1.05m £1.22m
Total expenditure £416.61k £358.21k £328.42k £1.10m £1.24m
Income from government contracts N/A £29.58k £16.30k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.80k £51.53k £12.25k £25.84k £14.18k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £638.04k £1.05m £1.21m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.55k £1.20k £1.18k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £920 £1.18k £5.07k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £5.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £191.25k £0 £77.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £265.26k £1.07m £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £63.17k £30.51k £74.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £8.30k £7.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £493.05k £663.27k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A £1 £1 £1
Other assets N/A N/A £437.64k £433.52k £530.82k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £4.51k £47.16k £162.80k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 4
Wayfaring House
Murley Moss Business Park
Oxenholme Road
Kendal
LA9 7RL
Phone:
07497 816091