DODLESTON VILLAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates and maintains the Dodleston Village Hall and Recreational Field
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £940 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 15 May 1980: Standard registration
- DVF (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Ian Lloyd | Chair | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cosgrove | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Peters | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Rahill | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Brooking | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Jon Talbot | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane McSalley-Bateman | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sue Ramsey | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bettley | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bowden | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.78k | £27.29k | £24.46k | £12.71k | £24.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.44k | £12.12k | £14.14k | £31.49k | £14.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.71k | £13.76k | N/A | £940 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 1980 AND 26 APRIL 1982.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
DODLESTON, LOWER KINNERTON AND MARLSTON CUM LACHE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dodleston Village Hall
Pulford Lane
Dodleston
CHESTER
CH4 9NN
- Phone:
- 01244661611
- Email:
- dvfcommittee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window