Accounts and annual returns THE CHELLASTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 August 2021 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 August 2021 16 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 August 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 August 2020 22 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 August 2019 19 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 August 2019 19 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 August 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 August 2018 08 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window