WEST YORKSHIRE SOCIETY OF ARCHITECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees have determined that their priorities for funding; The Dennis Mason-Jones Award, The Bedford Scholarship and Academic Awards (tertiary & secondary education). There remain funds available for grants and support to be dispersed as the Society sees fit and subject to satisfying the objects of the society in the areas of Social and Education support of Architectural and urban design.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 04 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Hales | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terence Dean | Trustee | 03 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULA JACKMAN RIBA | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN SMITH RIBA | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR G BAREHAM ARB RIBA FRSA FHEA UCU | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.52k | £22.52k | £14.07k | £25.25k | £23.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.17k | £12.17k | £9.27k | £19.77k | £14.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 December 2020 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 NOV 1885 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 MAR 2018 as amended on 21 Jul 2023 as amended on 21 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ART, SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF ARCHITECTURE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF YORKSHIRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: · AWARDING FINANCIAL PRIZES, BURSARIES AND OTHER AWARDS TO THOSE STUDYING ARCHITECTURE · ORGANISING, RUNNING AND FUNDING ARCHITECTURAL WORKSHOPS, COMPETITIONS AND EXHIBITIONS · IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hon' Secretary WYSA
c/o. Pearce Bottomley LLP
10 High Street
Tadcaster
LS24 9AT
- Phone:
- 01274551140
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window