LEICESTER CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1172819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download