LEICESTER CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1172819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AJAY AGGARWAL Trustee 09 June 2018
VOLUNTARY ACTION LEICESTER
Sadiq Ahamed Trustee 26 September 2020 None on record
Eric Nkundumubano Trustee 09 June 2018 None on record
Dr MARGARET BONNEY Trustee 09 June 2018 None on record
Danny Myers Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
GOLDEN NGWENYA Trustee 02 March 2017 None on record
Rev PETER HOBSON Chair 02 May 2017 None on record
Jenny Dnes Trustee 04 October 2017 None on record
Hagara Al-Katheri Trustee 26 September 2020 None on record