BIRMINGHAM CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to relieve the needs of children separated from parents and/or other family members through divorce and family breakdown in particular by the provision of a child contact centre to facilitate contact arrangements with non-resident parents and other family members in a safe, secure and neutral location.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 16 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ALAN VICKERS | Chair | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP WARD | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSIE WARD | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44 | £10.53k | £13.44k | £4.45k | £11.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £4.63k | £10.88k | £5.60k | £11.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SEPARATED FROM PARENTS AND/OR OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS THROUGH DIVORCE AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN IN PARTICULAR BY; A) THE PROVISION OF A CHILD CONTACT CENTRE TO FACILITATE CONTACT ARRANGEMENTS WITH NON-RESIDENT PARENTS AND OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS IN A SAFE, SECURE AND NEUTRAL LOCATION AND B) TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE COMMUNITY IN BIRMINGHAM AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 WELLS GREEN ROAD
SOLIHULL
B92 7PG
- Phone:
- 01212466665
- Email:
- info@birmccc.org.uk
- Website:
-
birmccc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window