Accounts and annual returns ELIZABETH MONTAGU CORRESPONDENCE ONLINE

Charity number: 1174697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 24 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 24 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 03 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 03 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 06 October 2019 159 days late Download Open in new window