THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF SPORTS HISTORY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting study and research into the history of sport through; providing grants for research activities, sponsorship of research projects, sponsorship of events, holding conferences and workshops, publishing a journal (Sport in History) and awarding prizes in the field of sports history. The Societies website is www.sportinhistory.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 2018: CIO registration
- BSSH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PEARSE REYNOLDS MA FCMA | Chair | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Furse | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luise Charlotte Elsaesser | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dilwyn Porter | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Kay Schiller | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW MCDOWELL | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.50k | £16.53k | £15.82k | £16.25k | £16.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.03k | £13.04k | £7.25k | £13.88k | £15.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 February 2025 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 February 2025 | 299 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2025 | 665 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HISTORICAL STUDY OF SPORT PHYSICAL EDUCATION RECREATION AND LEISURE WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE BRITISH ISLES AND ENCOURAGE SCHOLARSHIP IN THE RESEARCH, STUDY AND TEACHING OF THESE VARIOUS ASPECTS OF HISTORY
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 DOWNS BRIDGE ROAD
BECKENHAM
BR3 5EU
- Phone:
- 02086508517
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window