ALLENDALE LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1173463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download