Accounts and annual returns THE GEORGE GIBSON ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1176924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1205 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1571 days