Fruition

Charity number: 1175067
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 October 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 October 2020 35 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 October 2019 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 05 October 2019 35 days late Download