Accounts and annual returns SAIE

Charity number: 1176041
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 06 March 2025 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 06 March 2025 96 days late
Annual return 31 January 2023 25 March 2024 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 25 March 2024 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 04 January 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 20 January 2023 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 11 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 April 2021 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 21 April 2021 142 days late Download Open in new window