Governance THE COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN BAPTIST GENERAL PURPOSES CIO
Charity number: 1173961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 26 July 2017: CIO registration
- 05 April 2019: Funds received from 236933 CHARITIES ADMINISTERED ICW ST ANDREW'S HOSPITAL
- 08 April 2019: Funds received from 236935 ST ANDREW'S LODGE, CLEWER, ENDOWMENT TRUST
- 22 September 2021: Funds received from 236939 COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN BAPTIST GENERAL PURPOSES TRUS...
- 30 March 2022: Funds received from 236934 ST ANDREW'S CHARITY, CLEWER
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
- CSJB CIO (Working name)
- COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN BAPTIST GENERAL PURPOSES CIO (Previous name)
- COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN BAPTIST GENERAL PURPOSES TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.