WANSTEAD AND WOODFORD MIGRANT SUPPORT

Charity number: 1172757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download