Financial history WANSTEAD AND WOODFORD MIGRANT SUPPORT

Charity number: 1172757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.00k £834 £13.46k £56.80k £45.30k
Total expenditure £1.69k £1.65k £12.98k £36.23k £44.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A