THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISES FUNDS FOR ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST RCP SCHOOL TO PURCHASE EDUCATIONAL/RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bolton
Governance
- 25 July 1980: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 March 2014: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Mitchell | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £0 | £0 | £1.20k | £950 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.78k | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 8TH MAY 1980
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP FINANCIALLY ADN OTHERWISE THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS ST. JOHN'S ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL. TO PROVIDE SUCH MONIES AS MAY BE NECESSARY TO FACILITAT IN SUCH MANNER AS THE GOVERNORS FOR THE TIME BEING SHALL DECIDED THE OBJECT AND DO ALL SUCH LAWFUL ACTS OR THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE OBJECT OF THE FUND AND SO FAR AS MAY BE NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE TO DO SUCH THINGS OR ACTS IN COLLABERATION WITH ANY PERSON BODY INSTITUTION AUTHORITY OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST
RCP SCHOOL
DARWEN ROAD
BROMLEY CROSS
BOLTON
BL7 9HT
- Phone:
- 01204333440
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window