Trustees STAFFORDSHIRE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1173330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Blackburn Chair 01 July 2021
None on record
Vuk Ilic Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Jack Marshall Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Ryan Merrick Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Eleri Turner Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Lillith Tolley Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Hayden Tsang Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Anesu Choto Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Sally Elizabeth McGill Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Andy Wright Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
Danny Smith Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record