Financial history THE OLDHAM LIAISON OF EX-SERVICE MEN WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 510115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.00k £7.47k £6.81k £0 £4.67k
Total expenditure £4.08k £7.93k £6.10k £0 £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A