THE HIGHER PLACE (DISCIPLES OF CHRIST BIBLE CHURCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is involved in social outreach, youth work, provision of housing for vulnerable people, evangelistic activities; holding events to connect people to Jesus, life-giving relationships and God-Given destinies in accordance with the teachings of Jesus Christ. We also support individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adewale Olumide Adesanya | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
OKIEMUTE NESI SCOTT-EMUAKPOR | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOLAGBEMI ASENGUAH | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.59k | £45.79k | £85.21k | £74.32k | £121.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.93k | £32.61k | £57.45k | £82.54k | £114.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 May 2017 as amended on 16 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. MEANS OF BROADCASTING MESSAGES AND MUSIC AND TEACHING NATURE. 2. CONNECTING PEOPLE TO JESUS, LIFE-GIVING RELATIONSHIPS AND GOD-GIVEN DESTINIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF JESUS CHRIST. 3. SUPPORTING CHRIST FOLLOWERS / CHRISTIANS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, WORSHIP EXPERIENCES AND PRODUCING PUBLICATIONS. 4. PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR VULNERABLE PEOPLE 5. PROVISION OF RELIEF FOR THOSE IN NEED DUE TO AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hedley Dunk Ltd
Trinity House
3 Bullace Lane
Dartford
DA1 1BB
- Phone:
- 07424663805
- Email:
- love@thehigherplaceuk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window