ALNWICK DISTRICT FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1173294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Baker Trustee 12 July 2019 None on record
Marlene Gray Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Christine McElhone Trustee 14 November 2018 None on record
MAUREEN BUCHANAN Trustee 06 June 2017 None on record
CLIVE ROBERT GIBSON Trustee 20 July 2018 None on record