Trustees 14TH HOVE (ST ANDREWS PORTSLADE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1172771
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNY O'DONOGHUE Trustee 14 July 2016
None on record
KATHY BATES Trustee 20 July 2015
None on record
JONATHAN LEONARD Trustee 27 June 2014
None on record
TIMOTHY THORLEY Trustee 12 October 2010
None on record
SALLY THORLEY Trustee 01 September 2006
None on record