Accounts and annual returns THE WRENBURY RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 510141
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 March 2022 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 20 March 2022 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 10 May 2021 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 22 July 2020 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 13 January 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 11 June 2018 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required