Trustees BISHOP SUTTON PRE-SCHOOL AND FOREST CLUB
Charity number: 1172849

Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elizabeth Short | Chair | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Leslie Peter Mooyaart | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josie Bentley | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jayne Pursey | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Pilcher | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Bridge | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Dunn-Nail | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Samantha Louise Wise | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jane Tofts | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jayne Patterson | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Amy Curreel Hobbs | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA OAKLEY | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.