THE PACKARD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173462
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)