Financial history THE PACKARD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £265.83k £500.22k £650.00k £2.76m £820.01k
Total expenditure £345.91k £698.38k £561.72k £1.31m £868.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £500.00k £650.00k £2.76m £820.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £223 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £698.38k £561.72k £1.31m £868.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £37.56k £28.16k £44.37k £12.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £149.69k £149.69k £130.88k £855.26k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0