CHATHAM AND ROCHESTER MUSLIM COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1173229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 11 March 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 31 January 2020 360 days late Download