WEST DEVON SAFE HAVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of hardship amongst those granted refugee status in the borough of West Devon. To preserve and protect their physical and mental health and that of their dependants. To advance their education and training so as to advance them in life and assist them to adapt within a new community. To advance the education of the public about the issues relating to refugees and those seeking asylum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 16 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Cyril Squire | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Stewart | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMSON | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE DEW | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MILL | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MILLS-HICKS | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.67k | £10.36k | £9.15k | £7.51k | £7.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.14k | £13.89k | £12.54k | £8.08k | £16.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 January 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 15 January 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN THE BOROUGH OF WEST DEVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM .
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 Old Exeter Road
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 0JD
- Phone:
- 01822617735
- Email:
- westdevonsafehaven@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window