Trustees THE UK PYTHON ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Miriam Gail Ollis Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
Ann Jeanette Barr Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Vincent Anthony Prytherch Trustee 14 September 2019
None on record
Cecilia Liao Trustee 15 September 2018
None on record
Tania Allard Trustee 15 September 2018
None on record
Owen Peter Campbell Trustee 19 May 2017
None on record
Kristian Gordon Glass Trustee 19 May 2017
None on record