WHEELCHAIR WORLD

Charity number: 1175582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download