INDEPENDENT DANCE

Charity number: 1180239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lily Fernanda Munoz-Newsome Trustee 30 July 2019 None on record
EVA MARTINEZ Trustee 23 February 2016
SOUTH EAST DANCE LIMITED Received: On time
Dr EFROSINI PROTOPAPA Trustee 23 February 2016 None on record
Kimberley Harvey Trustee 12 May 2021 None on record
NICOLA ELIZABETH HOPE CHILDS Chair 02 August 2018 None on record
DR SARA BENHARD REED Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
ANDY WANSELL Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record