ALTON MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1174510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download