THE FRIENDS OF HEACHAM JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1175520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required