Accounts and annual returns LISTEN-HEAR!

Charity number: 1173906
Charity reporting is overdue by 278 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 278 days
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 278 days
Annual return 30 January 2021 25 October 2022 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2021 25 October 2022 329 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2019 25 February 2021 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 25 February 2021 240 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window