PENRHIWCEIBER OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.15k £4.31k £3.40k £3.27k £4.18k
Total expenditure £3.01k £2.95k £3.27k £5.68k £4.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A