Financial history CITY, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1173858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £1.19m £1.07m £1.15m £984.17k £1.33m
Total expenditure £1.03m £1.01m £940.17k £908.30k £1.34m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.04m £953.36k £959.39k £961.42k £1.23m
Income - Other trading activities £58.07k £54.66k £0 £1.58k £41.14k
Income - Charitable activities £86.80k £64.05k £190.92k £20.25k £52.22k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £306 £920 £1.35k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £961.42k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.01m £940.17k £908.30k £1.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £299 £2.78k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.36k £0 £12.15k £12.86k £9.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0