GLOBALGIRL MEDIA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our 3-week intensive GGM Academy training where the girls develop their own story ideas, blogs and films. Skills-booster training events that focus on keeping pace with changes in technology. Our newsroom is the place for our graduates to continue training, producing videos/blogs and cover events/conferences. We run a mentoring program & panel discussions/events,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 January 2018: Standard registration
- GGM UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bharti Patel | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marianne Stevens | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Eleanor Hill-Dixon | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Lam | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Clarke | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dila Su Yalman | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Catherine Elaine Desouza | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jorja Oladiran | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olamide Taiwo | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aleksandra Dimitrijevic | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.38k | £2.91k | £1.30k | £10.00k | £16.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.72k | £2.55k | £4.26k | £3.01k | £13.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
1.THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN SUB-CLAUSES (1) AND (2) BELOW. 1.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ACTING AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG WOMEN UP TO THE AGE OF 22 IN UNDER-REPRESENTED, UNDER-PRIVILEGED OR AT RISK COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING AND PROVIDING INFRASTRUCTURAL SUPPORT AS A MEANS OF: A.ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND B.ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG WOMEN BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2.THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX IN THE MEDIA, CULTURE AND ARTS. NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BROCKWELL PARK GARDENS
LONDON
SE24 9BL
- Phone:
- 07918885302
- Email:
- ggmuk@globalgirlmedia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window