THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, BELMONT

Charity number: 1173193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 December 2019 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 April 2018 On time Download