THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, BELMONT

Charity number: 1173193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICK HOLROYD Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
DOROTHY JANE MOORE Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Rev Canon Heather Murray Chair 28 July 2018
GILLIGATE CHURCH ESTATE CHARITY Received: On time
BELMONT PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION Received: On time
ST GILES EDUCATION TRUST Received: On time
CHARLOTTE REYNOLDS Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Jane Robson Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
MEGAN PORT Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
PAUL BEKEN Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Diane Jackson Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
ALAN PORT Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
JEAN FOULDS Trustee 03 April 2017
BELMONT PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION Received: On time
MARJORIE ELLIOTT Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
JULIE WINKLESS Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
GEOFFREY MOORE Trustee 03 April 2017
BELMONT PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION Received: On time
BELMONT EDUCATION TRUST Received: 31 days late
ST GILES EDUCATION TRUST Received: On time
Anne Corbett Trustee 03 April 2017
BELMONT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
BELMONT EDUCATION TRUST Received: 31 days late
GERALD IONS Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record