Financial history INSPIRED NEIGHBOURHOODS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1174417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £7.88k £217.68k £130.10k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £625 £16.83k £68.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A